WI SB23 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.44 (3) (c) (intro.) and 45.51 (2) (a) 1.; and to create 36.27 (2) (b) 5., 36.27 (3p) (a) 1r. g., 38.24 (8) (a) 1r. g. and 45.01 (12) (fm) of the statutes; Relating to: expanding veterans benefits to individuals who served in Laos in support of the United States during the Vietnam War.
Title
Expanding veterans benefits to individuals who served in Laos in support of the United States during the Vietnam War.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Representative Brandtjen added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs and Constitution and Federalism |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced |