WI SB228 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-07 - Published 11-18-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on November 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-07 - Published 11-18-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 23.33 (3) (e), 167.31 (2) (a) and 167.31 (2) (b); to amend 23.33 (11p) (e) 2., 167.31 (2) (c) and 167.31 (3) (a) 2.; and to create 23.33 (3) (eg), 23.33 (3) (er), 23.33 (3c) (title), 23.33 (3c) (b), 167.31 (1) (cm), 167.31 (1) (fg), 167.31 (2) (a) 3., 167.31 (2) (b) 3. and 167.31 (4) (ag) of the statutes; relating to: placing, possessing, or transporting a firearm, bow, or crossbow in or on a vehicle or in or on a motorboat.
Title
Placing, possessing, or transporting a firearm, bow, or crossbow in or on a vehicle or in or on a motorboat.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 4 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-07 | Senate | Published 11-18-2011 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-4-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 51 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-4-2011 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 11-4-2011 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 65, Noes 31, Paired 2 |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 36 |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr, Milroy, Clark and Danou |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 3 withdrawn and returned to author |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr, Danou, Clark and Milroy |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2011-11-01 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:11 A.M. on 11-03-2011 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 18 |
2011-11-01 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr, Danou, Hulsey, Milroy and Clark |
2011-11-01 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representatives Molepske Jr, Danou, Hulsey, Milroy and Clark |
2011-10-27 | House | Placed on calendar 11-1-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 5, Noes 2 by committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-10-18 | Senate | LRB correction |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Introduced |