WI SB225 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on November 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-14 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on November 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-14 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 29.014 (1s) of the statutes; Relating to: a uniform end date for certain open hunting and trapping seasons. (FE)
Title
A uniform end date for certain open hunting and trapping seasons. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | Senate | Published 11-12-2017 |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 63 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-08 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 3) |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Moulton |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Moulton |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Moulton |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Introduced |