WI SB220 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (7) (qg) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for the Fenwood Creek watershed pilot project. (FE)
Title
Funding for the Fenwood Creek watershed pilot project. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse James [R] | Sen. Cory Tomczyk [R] | Sen. Mark Spreitzer [D] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] |
Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Lori Palmeri [D] | Rep. Katrina Shankland [D] | Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Representative C. Anderson added as a cosponsor |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Introduced |