WI SB220 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 138.14 (10) (a) 1.; to amend 138.14 (13) (d) and 422.201 (3); and to create 138.14 (10) (a) 1g. of the statutes; Relating to: interest rates on payday loans.
Title
Interest rates on payday loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Representative Bowen added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |