WI SB220 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Published 12-1-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: outdated rules of the Department of Tourism and the Arts Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outdated rules of the Department of Tourism and the Arts Board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-04SenatePublished 12-1-2017
2017-12-04SenateReport approved by the Governor on 11-30-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 103
2017-11-28SenatePresented to the Governor on 11-28-2017
2017-11-10SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-11-08SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-11-07HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-11-07HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2017-11-07HouseRules suspended
2017-11-07HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-11-07HouseRead a second time
2017-11-07HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2017-11-02HousePlaced on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-11-01HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2017-10-31HouseReceived from Senate
2017-10-31SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-10-31SenateRead a third time and passed
2017-10-31SenateRules suspended
2017-10-31SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-10-31SenateRead a second time
2017-10-27SenatePlaced on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-09-08SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-09-08SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-09-07SenateExecutive action taken
2017-08-29SenatePublic hearing held
2017-05-04SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform
2017-05-04SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback