WI SB217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 255.085 of the statutes; Relating to: diabetes care and prevention plan. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diabetes care and prevention plan. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08HouseReceived from Senate
2019-10-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-08SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-10-08SenateRules suspended
2019-10-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-08SenateRead a second time
2019-10-04SenatePlaced on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-09-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-09-24SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-09-24SenateExecutive action taken
2019-08-06SenatePublic hearing held
2019-07-03SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-05-31SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-05-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-05-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback