WI SB21 | 2011 | September Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on December 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.07 (4), 20.536 (1) (k) and 25.14 (1) (a) (intro.); and to create 15.07 (1) (a) 7., 15.07 (5) (am), 15.77, 19.42 (10) (Lm), 19.42 (13) (km), 20.195, 25.17 (72), 25.17 (73), 25.90, 73.16, 230.08 (2) (yo) and chapter 555 of the statutes; relating to: creation of the Wisconsin Next Generation Reserve Board and Wisconsin next generation reserve fund, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice, services, and facilities to state agencies and others, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creation of the Wisconsin Next Generation Reserve Board and Wisconsin next generation reserve fund, authorizing the State of Wisconsin Investment Board to provide certain advice, services, and facilities to state agencies and others, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-13 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2011-11-07 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-10-25 | Senate amendment 3 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2011-10-25 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Lassa | |
2011-10-24 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2011-10-24 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard | |
2011-10-24 | Public hearing held | |
2011-10-20 | Senator Taylor added as a coauthor | |
2011-10-20 | Withdrawn from committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues and rereferred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) | |
2011-10-18 | Representatives Marklein, Molepske Jr and Kooyenga added as a cosponsors | |
2011-10-18 | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor | |
2011-10-18 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Issues | |
2011-10-18 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/se1/sen/bill/sb21 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/SE1/SB21.pdf |