WI SB209 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 6.87 (4) (b) 1.; and to create 6.87 (4) (b) 1. e. of the statutes; Relating to: returning absentee ballots to the office of the municipal clerk.
Title
Returning absentee ballots to the office of the municipal clerk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Carpenter |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Darling, Kooyenga and Bernier |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Representative Armstrong added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Darling |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |