WI SB204 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.20 (2r) of the statutes; Relating to: causing or threatening bodily harm to certain child welfare and juvenile justice workers, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Causing or threatening bodily harm to certain child welfare and juvenile justice workers, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Tiffany |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Tiffany |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb204 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB204.pdf |