WI SB203 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Action ordered immediately messaged
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 6.86 (1) (a) 1., 6.87 (4) (b) 1. and 12.60 (1) (a); and to create 6.856 and 12.13 (3) (md) of the statutes; Relating to: the secure delivery of absentee ballots and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The secure delivery of absentee ballots and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23SenateAction ordered immediately messaged
2021-06-23SenateAssembly Amendment 1 concurred in
2021-06-23SenateWithdrawn from Assembly message and taken up
2021-06-22SenateReceived from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
2021-06-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-06-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 60, Noes 38
2021-06-22HouseRules suspended
2021-06-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-06-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2021-06-22HouseRead a second time
2021-06-17HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative August
2021-06-16HousePlaced on calendar 6-22-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-06-16HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2021-06-11HouseRepresentative Dittrich added as a cosponsor
2021-05-19HouseRepresentative Plumer added as a cosponsor
2021-05-11HouseReceived from Senate
2021-05-11SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 21, Noes 12
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended
2021-05-11SenateOrdered to a third reading
2021-05-11SenateSenate Amendment 2 adopted
2021-05-11SenateRead a second time
2021-05-11SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-05-10SenateSenate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Stroebel
2021-05-07SenatePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2021-05-07SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-05-07SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-05-06SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel
2021-05-05SenatePublic hearing held
2021-04-23SenateFiscal estimate received
2021-03-16SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Election Process Reform and Ethics
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb203
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/SB203.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/SB203.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB203-SA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB203-SA2.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/SB203-AA1.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/sb203/sb203_elec.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/senate/elections_election_process_reform_and_ethics/1615335.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/SB203.pdf
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/sv0068
Roll Callhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/votes/2021/av0100

Bill Comments 750

feedback