WI SB203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.17 (1), 125.17 (4) (intro.), 125.17 (5) (b), 125.17 (6) (a) (intro.) and 125.17 (6) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: issuance by municipalities of alcohol beverage operator's licenses.
Title
Issuance by municipalities of alcohol beverage operator's licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 166 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:30 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefits, Licensing and State-Federal Relations |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Introduced |