WI SB200 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (5) (eh) and 51.73 of the statutes; Relating to: grants to prevent suicide by firearm and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants to prevent suicide by firearm and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senator Wanggaard added as a coauthor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Representative Shelton added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |