WI SB20 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 950.04 (1v) (df), 971.313 and 974.05 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining crime victim mental health treatment records. (FE)
Title
Obtaining crime victim mental health treatment records. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb20 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB20.pdf |