WI SB2 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 60.85 (1) (f), 66.1105 (2) (d), 70.043 (2), 70.13 (3), 70.13 (7), 70.18, 70.19, 70.20, 70.21, 70.22, 70.29, 70.30, 70.34, 70.345, 70.35, 70.36, 70.47 (15), 70.53 (1) (a), 70.65 (2) (a) 2., 70.68, 74.11 (4), 74.11 (11) (b), 74.11 (12) (a) 1g., 74.11 (12) (d), 74.12 (6), 74.12 (11) (a) 1g., 74.12 (11) (d), 74.30 (1) (i), 74.42, 74.47 (3) (e), 74.55 and 76.69; to renumber 70.043 (1) and 74.11 (11) (a); to consolidate, renumber and amend 70.65 (2) (a) (intro.) and 1.; to amend 17.14 (1) (g), 26.03 (1m) (b) (intro.), 33.01 (9) (a), 33.01 (9) (am) 1. and 2., 33.01 (9) (ar) 1., 33.01 (9) (b) 1., 60.85 (1) (h) 1. c., 60.85 (1) (o), 66.0435 (3) (c) 1. (intro.), 66.0435 (3) (g), 66.0435 (9), 66.1105 (2) (f) 1. c., 66.1106 (1) (k), 70.02, 70.05 (5) (a) 1., 70.17 (1), 70.174, 70.44 (1), 70.49 (2), 70.52, 70.65 (2) (b) (intro.), 70.73 (1) (b), 70.73 (1) (c), 70.73 (1) (d), 70.84, 70.855 (1) (intro.), 70.855 (1) (a), 70.855 (1) (b), 70.995 (1) (a), 70.995 (1) (b), 70.995 (4), 70.995 (7) (b), 70.995 (8) (b) 1., 70.995 (12) (a), 71.17 (2), 74.05 (1), 74.09 (2), 74.11 (6) (a), 74.11 (10) (a) 1., 74.11 (12) (a) (intro.), 74.11 (12) (b), 74.12 (7) (a), 74.12 (8) (a), 74.12 (9) (a), 74.12 (10) (a), 74.12 (11) (a) (intro.), 74.12 (11) (b), 74.25 (1) (intro.), 74.29 (2), 74.30 (1m), 74.83, 74.87 (3), 76.125 (1), 77.84 (1), 174.065 (3), 815.18 (3) (intro.) and 978.05 (6) (a); and to create 60.85 (5) (j), 66.1105 (5) (j), 66.1106 (4) (e), 70.015, 70.111 (28) and 70.17 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating the personal property tax. (FE)
Title
Eliminating the personal property tax. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities and Revenue, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-24 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Substitute Amendment 1) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senator Stafsholt added as a coauthor |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Representatives Binsfeld and Michalski added as cosponsors |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Representative Swearingen added as a cosponsor |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Introduced |