WI SB2 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Published 3-10-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 71.775 (4) (a) 1. and 71.775 (4) (a) 2.; to renumber and amend 71.775 (4) (a) (intro.); to amend 71.20 (1), 71.24 (1), 71.24 (9) (a), 71.29 (8) (a), 71.44 (1) (a), 71.44 (4) (b), 71.84 (2) (a) and 71.84 (2) (c); and to create 71.775 (4) (fm) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: due dates for filing income and franchise tax returns, paying estimated income and franchise tax installment payments, and filing withholding tax returns. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Due dates for filing income and franchise tax returns, paying estimated income and franchise tax installment payments, and filing withholding tax returns. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10SenatePublished 3-10-2017
2017-03-10SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-9-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 2
2017-03-08SenatePresented to the Governor on 3-8-2017
2017-03-08SenateReport correctly enrolled
2017-03-08SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2017-03-07HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-03-07HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 98, Noes 0
2017-03-07HouseRules suspended
2017-03-07HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-03-07HouseRead a second time
2017-03-07HouseRules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
2017-03-01HousePlaced on calendar 3-7-2017 by Committee on Rules
2017-02-27HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2017-02-27HouseReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-02-23HouseExecutive action taken
2017-02-13HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-08HouseReceived from Senate
2017-02-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2017-02-08SenateRead a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2017-02-08SenateRules suspended
2017-02-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2017-02-08SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2017-02-08SenateRead a second time
2017-02-06SenatePlaced on calendar 2-8-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-02-06SenateWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-02-06SenateReferred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2017-01-25SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-01-25SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 4, Noes 0
2017-01-25SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues, Ayes 4, Noes 0
2017-01-25SenateExecutive action taken
2017-01-23SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
2017-01-23SenateRepresentatives Spiros, Macco and Knodl added as cosponsors
2017-01-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-01-19SenateRepresentative Hutton added as a cosponsor
2017-01-18SenateRepresentative Petryk added as a cosponsor
2017-01-18SenatePublic hearing held
2017-01-13SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback