WI SB197 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 301.048 (2) (bm) 1. a., 895.035 (4a) (a) 2., 938.34 (14q), 941.291 (1) (b), 946.82 (4), 969.08 (10) (b) and 973.137 (1m); and to create 947.019 of the statutes; Relating to: making a false threat to use a firearm to injure or kill another person in a school zone and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Making a false threat to use a firearm to injure or kill another person in a school zone and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Bewley |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb197 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB197.pdf |