WI SB196 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-11)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Published 4-9-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 114.04; and to create 175.55, 941.292, 942.10 and 972.113 of the statutes; Relating to: restricting the use of drones and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Restricting the use of drones and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Published 4-9-2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 213 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Assembly Amendment 1 concurred in |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative August |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:23 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Petrowski |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Introduced |