WI SB196 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - Published 12-20-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 79.05 (2) (c) of the statutes; relating to: excluding from the calculation of expenditure restraint payments expenditures made pursuant to a purchasing agreement with a school district. (FE)
Title
Excluding from the calculation of expenditure restraint payments expenditures made pursuant to a purchasing agreement with a school district. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | Published 12-20-2011 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-7-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 106 |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-5-2011 |
2011-11-11 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 11-11-2011 |
2011-11-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2011-11-03 | House | Read |
2011-11-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senate amendment 2 adopted |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-2-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Education |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2011-09-21 | Senate | Introduced |