WI SB195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.435 of the statutes; Relating to: the display and sale of novelty lighters and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
The display and sale of novelty lighters and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Representatives Oldenburg, Edming and Ramthun added as cosponsors |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb195 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB195.pdf |