WI SB195 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 348.17 (5) of the statutes; relating to: seasonal weight limitations for certain vehicles transporting agricultural crops. (FE)
Title
Seasonal weight limitations for certain vehicles transporting agricultural crops. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-09-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Elections |
2011-09-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb195 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB195.pdf |