WI SB192 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 440.01 (1) (dm); and to create 440.08 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: renewals of certain credentials.
Title
Renewals of certain credentials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Licensing, Constitution and Federalism |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Introduced |