WI SB191 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.885 (1) (a) and 167.31 (2) (d); and to create 167.31 (4) (fm) of the statutes; Relating to: the authority to shoot a beaver or muskrat causing damage to a highway.
Title
The authority to shoot a beaver or muskrat causing damage to a highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-23-2021 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |