WI SB191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 67.05 (2) (a); to amend 67.05 (6a) (a) 2. (intro.), 119.10 (3), 120.08 (2) (c) and 120.43 (2); and to create 67.05 (2) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: consideration of resolution to issue bond by common and union high school districts and prohibiting voting on a resolution to exceed the revenue limit of a school district at a special meeting.
Title
Consideration of resolution to issue bond by common and union high school districts and prohibiting voting on a resolution to exceed the revenue limit of a school district at a special meeting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb191 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB191.pdf |