WI SB19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-13)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Published 5-1-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-13)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Published 5-1-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: terminology changes for those with an intellectual disability in administrative rules.
Title
Terminology changes for those with an intellectual disability in administrative rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Published 5-1-2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-30-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 1 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-25-2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Read a second time |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2019-04-09 | House | Read |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a coauthor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-9-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Representative Felzkowski added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Representative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Representatives Shankland and Macco added as cosponsors |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced |