WI SB185 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 448.970; to amend 15.085 (1m) (b), 146.997 (1) (d) 4., 155.01 (7), 448.03 (2) (a) and 450.10 (3) (a) 5.; and to create 15.406 (7), 146.81 (1) (eu), 252.14 (1) (ar) 4s., 440.03 (13) (b) 19c., 440.08 (2) (a) 24am. and subchapter VIII of chapter 448 [precedes 448.971] of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a clinical exercise physiology affiliated credentialing board, licensure of clinical exercise physiologists, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Creation of a clinical exercise physiology affiliated credentialing board, licensure of clinical exercise physiologists, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Shilling [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Lee Nerison [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] |
Rep. David Bowen [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb185 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB185.pdf |