WI SB184 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Published 4-19-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.855 (7) (a) of the statutes; and to affect 2011 Wisconsin Act 32, section 9152 (1tc) (e); relating to: the reporting date for the Special Task Force on UW Restructuring and Operational Flexibilities and making an appropriation.
Title
The reporting date for the Special Task Force on UW Restructuring and Operational Flexibilities and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Rep. Patricia Strachota [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-26 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Senate | Published 4-19-2012 |
2012-04-06 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-6-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 221 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-5-2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-1-2012 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Assembly amendment 1 concurred in |
2012-02-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-14-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly amended and concurred in as amended, Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2012-01-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-01-26 | House | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2012-01-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-01-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-01-26 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2012-01-26 | House | Read a second time |
2012-01-24 | House | Placed on calendar 1-26-2012 by committee on Rules |
2011-12-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-12-20 | House | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2011-12-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2011-11-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-11-01 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Strachota |
2011-11-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-10-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Colleges and Universities |
2011-10-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-18-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-13 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-09-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Higher Education |
2011-09-14 | Senate | Introduced |