WI SB182 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.44 (1) (title) and 440.44 (2) (title); to renumber 440.43 and 440.44 (1); to renumber and amend 440.44 (2) (a), 440.44 (2) (b) and 440.44 (2) (c); to amend 440.43 (title), 440.445 (1) (b) (intro.), 440.445 (3), 440.49 (3) and 440.495; and to create 440.43 (2), 440.453 (title), 440.453 (1) (b), 440.453 (1) (c) and 440.453 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of transportation network companies and their drivers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulation of transportation network companies and their drivers and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Larson [D] | Sen. Kathleen Vinehout [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] |
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb182 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB182.pdf |