WI SB182 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 256.15 (2); to amend 256.15 (2) (title) and 256.15 (11) (a) and (c); and to create 256.15 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: an exemption from licensing requirements for certain out-of-state ambulance service providers. (FE)
Title
An exemption from licensing requirements for certain out-of-state ambulance service providers. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] |
Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Travis Tranel [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] |
Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 26 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-17 | Senate | LRB correction |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kolste |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 64, Noes 35 |
2015-06-09 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kolste |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2015-06-09 | House | Read |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Introduced |