WI SB18 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 66.0137 (4m) (a); to renumber and amend 66.0137 (1) (ae); to amend 66.0137 (3), 66.0137 (5) (c) 2. and 66.0137 (5) (c) 3. (intro.); and to create 66.0137 (1) (am), 66.0137 (1) (c) and 66.0137 (5) (c) 1m. of the statutes; relating to: requiring political subdivisions to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a law enforcement officer who dies, or has died, in the line of duty. (FE)
Title
Requiring political subdivisions to pay health insurance premiums for survivors of a law enforcement officer who dies, or has died, in the line of duty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Read a third time and passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 2 offered by Representative Spanbauer |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2011-10-26 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 3 |
2011-10-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2011-10-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2011-10-26 | House | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance |
2011-10-26 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by joint committee on Finance |
2011-10-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-10-03 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2011-10-03 | House | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-10-03 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-09-13 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2011-09-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-09-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-08-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-08-25 | House | Senator King added as a coauthor |
2011-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2011-05-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senator Kapanke added as a coauthor |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 adopted |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senator Erpenbach added as a coauthor |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 to Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senators Hopper and Wanggaard |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 6, Noes 0 by committee on Insurance and Housing |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senator Hopper added as a coauthor |
2011-03-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-02-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance and Housing |
2011-02-11 | Senate | Introduced |