WI SB18 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.27 (3m) (b) (intro.), 36.27 (3m) (b) 1., 36.27 (3m) (c) and 38.24 (5) (b) 1. of the statutes; relating to: fee remissions for certain University of Wisconsin System and technical college students.
Title
Fee remissions for certain University of Wisconsin System and technical college students.
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. David Hansen [D] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Rep. Ann Hraychuck [D] |
Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Plale [D] | Rep. James Soletski [D] | Sen. Robert Wirch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-03-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-01-28 | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture and Higher Education | |
2009-01-28 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb18 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB18.pdf |