WI SB178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 59.60 (2) (a); to amend 59.53 (6) (a) 2., 59.54 (27) (a), 59.60 (4) (intro.), 59.60 (4) (a), 59.60 (4) (b), 59.60 (5) (intro.), 59.60 (5) (a), 59.60 (6) (b) 2., 59.60 (6) (b) 3., 59.60 (6) (c), 59.60 (7), 59.60 (8) (a), 59.60 (10), 65.01, 65.02 (5) (intro.), 65.02 (6) (a), 65.02 (6) (b) (intro.), 65.02 (8) (intro.), 65.02 (10), 65.02 (11), 65.03 (1), 65.04 (1), 65.04 (2), 65.04 (4), 65.04 (5), 65.05 (4), 65.05 (5), 65.05 (8), 65.05 (9), 65.06 (1), 65.06 (5) (intro.), 65.06 (14), 65.06 (15), 65.20 (1) (a), 65.20 (1) (b), 65.20 (1) (c), 65.20 (1) (d), 65.20 (1) (e), 65.20 (1) (g), 65.20 (1) (h), 65.90 (1), 65.90 (2), 65.90 (3) (a) (intro.), 65.90 (3) (a) 1., 65.90 (3) (b) (intro.), 65.90 (3) (bm), 65.90 (4), 65.90 (5) (a), 65.90 (5) (b) and 65.90 (6) (intro.); and to create 59.60 (2) (ae), 59.60 (3s), 65.02 (5m), 65.025, 65.90 (1m) and 65.90 (5) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing a biennial budget procedure for political subdivisions. (FE)
Title
Authorizing a biennial budget procedure for political subdivisions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb178 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB178.pdf |