WI SB178 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Published 12-17-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Published 12-17-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 254.18; to amend 254.18 (title); and to create 254.18 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: exemption from lead inspection requirements for sampling or testing during certain lead-safe renovations. (FE)
Title
Exemption from lead inspection requirements for sampling or testing during certain lead-safe renovations. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] |
Sen. David Craig [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-06 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-11-06 - Senate - Senate: Refused to refer to committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Published 12-17-2015 |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-16-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 122 |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-14-2015 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-11-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-16 | House | Read a second time |
2015-11-12 | House | Referred to calendar of 11-16-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Passed, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Refused to refer to committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 14, Noes 18 |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Public Benefit and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Public Benefit and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Harsdorf |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Lazich |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Health and Human Services and rereferred to committee on Public Benefit and Regulatory Reform pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |