WI SB170 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-1)
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 563.92 (1m) (c) 1.; and to create 563.03 (5r) (c), 563.03 (10q), 563.03 (10r) and 563.935 (9m) of the statutes; Relating to: paddlewheel raffles. (FE)
Title
Paddlewheel raffles. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Report vetoed by the Governor on 5-21-2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 5-20-2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2021-05-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-05-11 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 61, Noes 35 |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-05-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Read a second time |
2021-05-11 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-05-06 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-04-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-14-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |