WI SB170 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Published 12-17-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Published 12-17-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 939.74 (2d) (c); and to create 939.74 (2) (ar) of the statutes; Relating to: statute of limitations for second-degree or third-degree sexual assault.
Title
Statute of limitations for second-degree or third-degree sexual assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | Senate | Published 12-17-2015 |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 12-16-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 121 |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 12-14-2015 |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-11-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-16 | House | Representative Meyers added as a cosponsor |
2015-11-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 91, Noes 1 |
2015-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-11-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-16 | House | Read a second time |
2015-11-12 | House | Referred to calendar of 11-16-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Senator C. Larson added as a coauthor |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Representative Heaton added as a cosponsor |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Introduced |