WI SB169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 281.36 (3r) (a) 1.; to amend 281.36 (3r) (am); and to create 281.36 (1) (ae), 281.36 (1) (ag), 281.36 (1) (be), 281.36 (3r) (a) 1. b., c. and d., 281.36 (3t) (g) and 281.36 (3w) of the statutes; Relating to: wetland mitigation banks, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Title
Wetland mitigation banks, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-26-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 59 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Representative McGuire added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 10th order of business on the calendar of 10-8-2019 |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Wanggaard, Cowles and Wirch |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Wanggaard and Cowles |
2019-08-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Wanggaard, Cowles and Wirch |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced |