WI SB168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 46.22 (1) (b) 5m. d., 46.22 (2g) (d) 4., 46.23 (5) (n) 3. and 301.031; to amend 13.94 (1) (v), 46.011 (1p), 46.21 (2) (j), 46.215 (3), 46.23 (5) (c) 3., 46.23 (5m) (c), 48.023 (4), 48.527, 48.66 (1) (b), 49.11 (1c), 49.45 (25) (bj), 101.123 (1) (ac) 2., 301.01 (1n), 301.027, 301.373, 938.02 (4), 938.02 (15g), 938.22 (1) (a), 938.22 (2) (d) 2., 938.33 (1) (c), 938.33 (3r), 938.34 (4m) (intro.), 938.34 (4n) (intro.), 938.355 (2) (b) 1., 938.355 (2) (b) 2., 938.355 (2) (b) 6m., 938.357 (3) (b) (intro.) and (c), 938.357 (4g) (a), 938.48 (3), 938.48 (4), 938.48 (4m) (b), 938.48 (5), 938.48 (6), 938.48 (14), 938.505 (1), 938.52 (2) (a) and (c), 938.53, 938.533 (2) (intro.), 938.54, 938.57 (4) and 938.78 (3); to repeal and recreate 938.34 (4m) (intro.); to create 46.057 (1m), 938.33 (6), 938.355 (2) (b) 2m., 938.355 (2) (b) 6n., 938.357 (3) (e) and (f) and 938.357 (4) (as) of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 38, 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 70, 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (1) (a), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (2) (a), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (3) (c), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (a) 1. c., 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (d), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (e), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (4) (f), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (6) (e), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (7), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 110 (7m) (b), 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 111 (3) and 2017 Wisconsin Act 185, section 112 (1); Relating to: facilities for holding juveniles in secure custody. (FE)
Title
Facilities for holding juveniles in secure custody. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 4 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Amendment 4 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-19 | Senate | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 3) |
2019-06-19 | Senate | LRB correction |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senator Cowles |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Wanggaard and L. Taylor |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Cowles |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb168 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB168.pdf |