WI SB167 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 101.12 (1) (intro.), 101.12 (2) and 101.19 (1g) (a); and to create 101.12 (2m) and 145.02 (5) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: examination of building plans for public buildings, public structures, and places of employment, and examination of plumbing plans. (FE)
Title
Examination of building plans for public buildings, public structures, and places of employment, and examination of plumbing plans. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Representative Kurtz added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Representative Moses added as a cosponsor |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Representatives Sortwell and Callahan added as cosponsors |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Representative Allen added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senator Stafsholt added as a coauthor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |