WI SB166 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 322.001 (16) and 322.120 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 322.120 (3) (b); to amend 322.001 (15), 322.036, 322.056 (2), 322.056 (5), 322.120 (3) (a) (intro.) and 322.133; and to create 321.04 (1) (s), 321.04 (1) (t), 322.0935, 322.120 (3) (b) 1., 322.1325 and 322.1345 of the statutes; Relating to: punitive articles in the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice prohibiting certain activities; procedures applicable to courts-martial cases under the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; treatment of victims of an offense under the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; defining military offenses under the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; punishments for violations of the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; and the removal of gender-specific language from the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Punitive articles in the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice prohibiting certain activities; procedures applicable to courts-martial cases under the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; treatment of victims of an offense under the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; defining military offenses under the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; punishments for violations of the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice; and the removal of gender-specific language from the Wisconsin Code of Military Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-07SenatePublished 12-7-2023
2023-12-07SenateReport approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 47
2023-11-30SenatePresented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
2023-11-15SenateReport correctly enrolled
2023-11-15SenateLRB correction
2023-11-10SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2023-11-09HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2023-11-09HouseRepresentative Cabrera added as a cosponsor
2023-11-09HouseRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 92, Noes 5
2023-11-09HouseRules suspended
2023-11-09HouseOrdered to a third reading
2023-11-09HouseRead a second time
2023-10-12HousePlaced on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
2023-10-11HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2023-09-14HouseReceived from Senate
2023-09-14SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2023-09-14SenateRead a third time and passed
2023-09-14SenateRules suspended to give bill its third reading
2023-09-14SenateOrdered to a third reading
2023-09-14SenateRead a second time
2023-09-12SenatePlaced on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2023-09-06SenateAvailable for scheduling
2023-09-06SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2023-09-05SenateExecutive action taken
2023-08-08SenatePublic hearing held
2023-06-07SenateRepresentative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
2023-04-03SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
2023-04-03SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback