WI SB166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Published 11-26-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.60 (1) (ag), 36.60 (3) (a), 36.60 (3) (am), 36.60 (5) (b) (intro.), 36.61 (1) (am) and 36.61 (5) (b) (intro.); and to create 36.60 (1) (ah), 36.60 (5) (bm) and 36.61 (5) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: eligibility for physician, dentist, and health care provider educational loan assistance programs. (FE)
Title
Eligibility for physician, dentist, and health care provider educational loan assistance programs. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 adopted (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Senate | Published 11-26-2019 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-25-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 58 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Representative Bowen withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Representative C. Taylor withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to calendar of 11-7-2019 pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (1)(a) |
2019-11-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 adopted, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 adopted |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Darling |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Introduced |