WI SB165 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.435 (1) (fi) and 146.616 of the statutes; Relating to: grants for education and training of allied health professionals and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Grants for education and training of allied health professionals and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb165 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB165.pdf |