WI SB159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 5.07; to amend 5.05 (1) (e), 5.056, 5.06 (2), 5.25 (4) (b), 5.35 (6) (a) (intro.), 5.35 (6) (a) 5., 5.35 (6) (b), 5.35 (6) (c), 6.33 (2) (a), 6.35 (3), 6.86 (1) (b), 6.86 (3) (c), 12.09 (1), 12.09 (3), 12.60 (1) (a), 12.60 (4) and 85.61 (1); and to create 5.07 (2), 5.25 (4) (c), 5.35 (6) (a) 4c., 5.35 (6) (d), 6.256, 6.29 (2) (e), 7.08 (3) (d) to (g), 7.08 (13), 7.08 (14), 7.10 (11), 7.15 (16), 12.17, 12.19, 12.60 (1) (am), 12.60 (1) (an), 12.60 (1) (ap), 12.60 (1) (bn) and 343.14 (2p) of the statutes; Relating to: automatic voter registration, deceptive election practices, voter intimidation and suppression, voter rights, polling place posting and language requirements, election manual requirements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Automatic voter registration, deceptive election practices, voter intimidation and suppression, voter rights, polling place posting and language requirements, election manual requirements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections, Ethics and Rural Issues |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb159 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB159.pdf |