WI SB159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.01 (2) (d) 2. b. and 118.33 (1) (a) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: education about nutrition.
Title
Education about nutrition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 152 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2018 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Olsen |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced |