WI SB159 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 175.35 (1) (b); to renumber 175.35 (2) (a), (b), (c) and (d) and 175.35 (2j); to renumber and amend 175.35 (2) (intro.) and 175.35 (2i); to amend 20.455 (2) (gr), 175.35 (title), 175.35 (1) (at), 175.35 (2g) (a), 175.35 (2g) (b), 175.35 (2g) (c) 4. c., 175.35 (2k) (ar) 2., 175.35 (2k) (c) 2. a., 175.35 (2k) (c) 2. b., 175.35 (2k) (g), 175.35 (2k) (h), 175.35 (2L), 175.35 (2t) (a), (b) and (c), 175.60 (7) (d), 175.60 (15) (b) 4. b., 938.208 (1) (b), 938.34 (4m) (b) 2., 938.341, 941.237 (1) (d), 941.296 (1) (b), 968.20 (3) (b), 971.17 (1g) and 973.176 (1); and to create 175.33, 175.35 (2) (bm), 175.35 (2) (cm) (intro.), 175.35 (2i) (b) 2., 175.35 (2j) (b), 941.29 (1) (dm), 941.29 (1) (dn), 941.29 (1) (do), 941.29 (2) (dm), 941.29 (2) (dn) and 941.29 (2) (do) of the statutes; Relating to: sales and transfers of firearms and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Sales and transfers of firearms and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Representative Considine added as a cosponsor |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb159 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB159.pdf |