WI SB153 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on November 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-12 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on November 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-12 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 342.40 (2), 342.40 (3) (b), 342.40 (3) (c), 342.40 (3) (e), 968.20 (3) and 973.075 (4); and to create 45.095 of the statutes; Relating to: donation of abandoned or seized vehicles.
Title
Donation of abandoned or seized vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | Senate | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 106 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-09-24 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-09-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-24 | House | Read a second time |
2015-09-24 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-09-22 | House | Placed on calendar 9-24-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators L. Taylor, Lassa, Shilling, Erpenbach, Miller, Harris Dodd, Bewley, Ringhand and C. Larson |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Harsdorf |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |