WI SB151 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0414 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting local ordinances, resolutions, and policies that prohibit the enforcement of federal or state law relating to illegal aliens or immigration status, authorizing certain elective officeholders to commence an enforcement action, providing a reduction in shared revenue payments, and creating governmental liability for damages caused by illegal aliens. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting local ordinances, resolutions, and policies that prohibit the enforcement of federal or state law relating to illegal aliens or immigration status, authorizing certain elective officeholders to commence an enforcement action, providing a reduction in shared revenue payments, and creating governmental liability for damages caused by illegal aliens. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb151 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB151.pdf |