WI SB151 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Published 7-18-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-7)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Published 7-18-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 234.59 (3) (e) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: the homeownership mortgage loan program administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority.
Title
The homeownership mortgage loan program administered by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Senate | Published 7-18-2013 |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 7-17-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 40 |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 7-11-2013 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2013-06-06 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-06 | House | Representative Young added as a cosponsor |
2013-06-06 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-06 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-06 | House | Read a second time |
2013-06-04 | House | Placed on calendar 6-6-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a coauthor |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Housing |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Introduced |