WI SB142 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on November 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on November 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-22 - Published 11-22-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 36.27 (7) and 38.24 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: late payment of tuition benefits for student veterans enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or a technical college. (FE)
Title
Late payment of tuition benefits for student veterans enrolled in the University of Wisconsin System or a technical college. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-22 | Senate | Published 11-22-2019 |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 11-21-2019. 2019 Wisconsin Act 47 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 11-19-2019 by directive of the President, pursuant to Senate Rule 44m (3) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Kooyenga |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Representative Wittke added as a cosponsor |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Senator Jacque added as a coauthor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Representative Fields added as a cosponsor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduced |