WI SB137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 101.05 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: certain buildings used for social events. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certain buildings used for social events. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-16SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-16SenateReport adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-14SenateExecutive action taken
2018-01-26SenateRereferred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c)
2018-01-03SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
2017-06-01SenatePublic hearing held
2017-04-12SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-03-29SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade
2017-03-29SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback