WI SB135 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.95 (1); and to create 346.89 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: the use of a cellular or other wireless telephone while driving a motor vehicle in a construction zone and providing a penalty.
Title
The use of a cellular or other wireless telephone while driving a motor vehicle in a construction zone and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Representative A. Ott added as a cosponsor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb135 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB135.pdf |